Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 04/26/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/26/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/27/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 09/04/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/05/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/16/2008