Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 05/01/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 05/01/2007
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/17/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/05/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/06/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/06/2007
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 08/01/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/04/2007