Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 05/01/2007
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 05/01/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/02/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/02/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/02/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/03/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 05/03/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/07/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/11/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/14/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/15/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/21/2007
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/21/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/11/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/22/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/27/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/11/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/16/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/12/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/17/2007