There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Methamphetamine Production Prevention Act of 2008

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Methamphetamine Production Prevention Act of 2008

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Methamphetamine Production Prevention Act of 2008

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Methamphetamine Production Prevention Act of 2008

Short Titles as Introduced

Methamphetamine Production Prevention Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

A bill to facilitate the creation of methamphetamine precursor electronic logbook systems, and for other purposes.

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish a grant program to facilitate the creation of methamphetamine precursor electronic logbook systems, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
10/14/2008Became Public Law No: 110-415. (TXT | PDF)
10/14/2008Signed by President.
10/03/2008Presented to President.
09/29/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H10621-10622)
09/29/2008Committee on Judiciary discharged.
09/29/2008Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
09/25/2008Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9461-9463; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S9461-9462)
09/15/2008Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
05/03/2007Introduced in Senate

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
10/14/2008Became Public Law No: 110-415. (TXT | PDF)
10/14/2008Signed by President.
10/03/2008SenatePresented to President.
09/29/2008-2:44pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/29/2008-2:44pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H10621-10622)
09/29/2008-2:44pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H10621-10622)
09/29/2008HouseCommittee on Judiciary discharged.
09/29/2008HouseCommittee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
09/29/2008-2:44pmHouseMr. Markey asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
09/25/2008HouseReferred to House Judiciary
09/25/2008HouseReferred to House Energy and Commerce
09/25/2008HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/25/2008SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/25/2008-6:01pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/25/2008SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9461-9463; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S9461-9462)
09/15/2008SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 962.
09/15/2008SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/11/2008SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/03/2007SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5566-5567)
05/03/2007SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S5565-5566)

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary05/03/2007 Referred to
09/11/2008 Markup by
09/15/2008 Reported by
House Energy and Commerce09/25/2008 Referred to
09/29/2008 Discharged from
House Judiciary09/25/2008 Referred to
09/29/2008 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.1276. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-415 (10/14/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on September 15, 2008. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Methamphetamine Production Prevention Act of 2008 - Amends the Controlled Substances Act to expand written and electronic logbook requirements applicable to sellers and purchasers of listed chemicals (e.g., legal substances used in the production of methamphetamine).

Requires retail sellers of listed chemicals to use an electronic logbook or a bound paper book to obtain required information (i.e., name and address of purchaser, date and time of sale, and quantity sold) for sales of listed chemicals. Requires an electronic logbook to capture signatures in an electronic format. Requires a bound paper book to include: (1) a clear line for the purchaser's signature; and (2) a sticker affixed to the book at the time of sale which displays the name of each product sold, the quantity sold, the name and address of the purchaser, and the date and time of the sale or a unique identifier that can be linked to electronic or written information.

Requires sellers and purchasers of listed chemicals to verify the accuracy of information entered into an electronic logbook or bound paper book.

Requires sellers of listed chemicals to maintain entries in written logbooks or electronic formats for not fewer than two years.