Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/03/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 05/03/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 05/03/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 05/03/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 05/03/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/07/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/09/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/22/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/09/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/15/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 10/22/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 12/06/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 12/06/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/23/2008