Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 05/03/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 05/03/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/14/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 10/26/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/29/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 11/13/2007