Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 05/03/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 05/03/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/11/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/15/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/05/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/11/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/19/2007
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/20/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/26/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/11/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/12/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/26/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 09/05/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/26/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/15/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/15/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 10/15/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 10/15/2007
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 10/25/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 12/19/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 01/22/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 03/05/2008
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 04/01/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/22/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 05/07/2008