Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 05/07/2007
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 05/07/2007
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/17/2007
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/21/2007
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 06/12/2007
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 04/10/2008