Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 05/07/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 05/11/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/11/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 05/11/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/04/2007
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 06/19/2007
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/20/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/19/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 08/01/2007