Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/14/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/15/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/16/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 08/03/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/04/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/04/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/11/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/20/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/26/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 01/30/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 01/31/2008
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/14/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/07/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/23/2008
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/08/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/11/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/11/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/16/2008