Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 05/08/2007
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/10/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/13/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 10/04/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 10/15/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 01/23/2008
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 01/31/2008
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 02/05/2008
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 09/17/2008