Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 05/10/2007
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 05/10/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 05/10/2007
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/07/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/11/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/20/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/28/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 07/16/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/24/2007
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 08/03/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/04/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 09/12/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 10/04/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 10/31/2007