Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 05/10/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 05/10/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/10/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/15/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/15/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/17/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/21/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/12/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/16/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/10/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/25/2007
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 10/22/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 10/22/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 10/24/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 10/24/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/01/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 11/19/2008