There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Bridging the Gap for Wounded Warriors Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to improve health care for severely injured members and former members of the Armed Forces, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/10/2007Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
05/10/2007Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: Senate
05/10/2007Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S5936-5937)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 05/10/2007
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/21/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/04/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/11/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/11/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/21/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/13/2007

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Armed Services05/10/2007 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.1363.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1363. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/10/2007)

Bridging the Gap for Wounded Warriors Act - Requires a member of the Armed Forces (member) who is medically retired because of physical disability incurred in or aggravated by military service to be treated as an active-duty member, for purposes of entitlement to military health care services and benefits, for the longer of: (1) the two-year period after medical retirement; or (2) the period during which the member is on the temporary disability retirement list. Requires active-duty members receiving health care and services through the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) for an injury or illness which would qualify for medical retirement to be treated as a veteran for the longer of: (1) the two-year period after the member incurs the injury or illness; or (2) the period during which the member is assigned to the VA for health care services and benefits.

Directs the Secretaries of Defense and Veterans Affairs to establish a joint office for the Department of Defense (DOD) and VA for the coordination of assistance to members in their transition from military service to civilian life.

Requires each member determined to be unfit to perform required duties to: (1) be evaluated by a disability ratings team at the appropriate military medical treatment facility; and (2) either placed on the temporary disability retired list or further evaluated for assignment of a final disability rating. Allows member appeal of a determination of unfitness. Requires final disability ratings to be used for determining eligibility for retired pay and other benefits.

Requires an interim and final report from the Comptroller General to Congress on DOD and VA programs for the assessment and treatment of wounded members.