Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/24/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/11/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/11/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/27/2007
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/25/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 08/02/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/02/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 12/07/2007
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 02/25/2008