Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 05/14/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/14/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/14/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 08/02/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 08/02/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/27/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 11/16/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/25/2008
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/13/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/13/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/08/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/23/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 07/30/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/31/2008
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/09/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/16/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/01/2008