Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/15/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/15/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/17/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/17/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/17/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/21/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/21/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/21/2007
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/21/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/21/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/22/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/24/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 05/24/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/24/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/25/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/04/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/04/2007
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/05/2007
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 06/05/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/06/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 06/06/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/11/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/11/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/12/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/13/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/13/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 06/18/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/18/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/19/2007
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/19/2007
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/19/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/19/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/20/2007
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/28/2007
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 06/28/2007
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/09/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/11/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/11/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/23/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 07/23/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 08/02/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/10/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/11/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/12/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 09/19/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/21/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/21/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/21/2007
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/25/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/25/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/28/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/28/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/01/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/01/2007
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 10/02/2007
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 10/03/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 10/15/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/17/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/18/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 10/18/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 10/19/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/25/2007
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 10/26/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 11/14/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 11/14/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 11/14/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 12/06/2007
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 12/14/2007
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 02/07/2008
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/14/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 02/27/2008
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/01/2008
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 05/12/2008
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 05/14/2008
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 05/19/2008
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/22/2008
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/15/2008