Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 05/15/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/15/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 05/15/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 05/15/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/27/2007
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/09/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/04/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 09/04/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 10/04/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/19/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 11/13/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 11/14/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 12/11/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 12/11/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 12/14/2007