Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 05/15/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/21/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/04/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/27/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 10/15/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 10/23/2007
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 12/03/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 12/05/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 01/22/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 02/27/2008