Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 05/16/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/05/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/19/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/22/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/27/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/29/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/18/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/25/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/25/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/03/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/18/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 01/22/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/06/2008