Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 05/17/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/21/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 05/25/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/07/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/14/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 06/18/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/19/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/20/2007
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/17/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/23/2007
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 07/24/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 08/01/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 10/02/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 11/16/2007
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 12/10/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/06/2008