Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 05/17/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/24/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/24/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 05/24/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/05/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/06/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/25/2007
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 06/26/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/26/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/17/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/17/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 07/19/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/19/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/19/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 09/10/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/11/2007
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 09/18/2007
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 09/19/2007
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 10/17/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 12/05/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 12/05/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 12/07/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 01/28/2008
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 02/07/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/11/2008
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 02/14/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/03/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/05/2008
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/01/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/14/2008
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 05/20/2008
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/22/2008
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/22/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/10/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/17/2008
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/09/2008
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/11/2008