Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 05/22/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/20/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/21/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 10/16/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/23/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 04/08/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/08/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/08/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/17/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 04/17/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/29/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/29/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/19/2008