Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 05/22/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/04/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/04/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/06/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/10/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/16/2007