Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/18/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/18/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/18/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/10/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/18/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/23/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/23/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 08/01/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/05/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/11/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/17/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/04/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 10/04/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/15/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 11/02/2007