Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 05/23/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/23/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/23/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/23/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/24/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/24/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/24/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/24/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/04/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/04/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/04/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/04/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/05/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/05/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/05/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/05/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/05/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/06/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/06/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/06/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/07/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/07/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/12/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/12/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/14/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 06/19/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/20/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/20/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/20/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/20/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/21/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/26/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/26/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/16/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/16/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 07/17/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 11/01/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/07/2008