Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/23/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/23/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 05/23/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 06/05/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/05/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/05/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/12/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/19/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 07/31/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 09/11/2007