Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 05/23/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/23/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/18/2007
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 09/20/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/24/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 10/22/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 10/22/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 11/14/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/09/2008