Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 05/24/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 05/24/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 05/24/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/09/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/17/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/05/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/11/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 11/16/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 02/08/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/06/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/31/2008