Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 05/24/2007
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 05/24/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/07/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/12/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/12/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/13/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/13/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 06/18/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/27/2007