Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 05/24/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/24/2007
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 05/24/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 05/24/2007
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 05/24/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 05/24/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 05/24/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/24/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 05/24/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/24/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 05/24/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/25/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/25/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/04/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/05/2007
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/11/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/25/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/19/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/26/2007