Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/14/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/11/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/15/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/17/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/18/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 10/24/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/26/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 11/07/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/07/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 11/13/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 12/04/2007
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 12/04/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 12/05/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 12/06/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 12/07/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/04/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/09/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 04/15/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/24/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/09/2008