Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 05/24/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 09/18/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/18/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/25/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/19/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 12/18/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 01/22/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/29/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/06/2008