Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 05/24/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/05/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/05/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/05/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/05/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/05/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/06/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/06/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/12/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/12/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/19/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/19/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/27/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/12/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/02/2007