There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the transfer of certain funds from the Senate Gift Shop Revolving Fund to the Senate Employee Child Care Center.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
06/21/2007Became Public Law No: 110-39. (TXT | PDF)
06/21/2007Signed by President.
06/14/2007Presented to President.
06/06/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H6015)
05/25/2007Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6968-6969; text as passed Senate: CR S6969)
05/25/2007Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
06/21/2007Became Public Law No: 110-39. (TXT | PDF)
06/21/2007Signed by President.
06/14/2007SenatePresented to President.
06/06/2007-10:31amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/06/2007-10:31amHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H6015)
06/06/2007-10:31amHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H6015)
06/06/2007-10:30amHouseMr. Brady (PA) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
06/05/2007-4:58pmHouseHeld at the desk.
06/05/2007-2:04pmHouseReceived in the House.
05/25/2007SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/25/2007SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6968-6969; text as passed Senate: CR S6969)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 05/25/2007

Committees (0)

As of 12/06/2019 text has not been received for S.1537 - A bill to authorize the transfer of certain funds from the Senate Gift Shop Revolving Fund to the Senate Employee Child Care Center.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


No related bill information was received for S.1537.


Subjects (13)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.1537. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-39 (06/21/2007)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes the Secretary of the Senate to transfer from the Senate Gift Shop Revolving Fund to the Senate Employee Child Care Center proceeds from the sale of holiday ornaments in order to fund necessary Center activities and expenses, including scholarships, educational supplies, and equipment.