Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 01/11/2007
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 05/02/2007
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 09/17/2007
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 07/31/2008