Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/06/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/06/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/06/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 06/06/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/06/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/06/2007
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/06/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/07/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/19/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/20/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/25/2007
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 09/25/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/25/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/27/2007
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 09/27/2007