Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 06/06/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 06/06/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 06/06/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 06/06/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 06/06/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 06/06/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 06/06/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/11/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/11/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/12/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/20/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/30/2007