Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 01/17/2007
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 01/17/2007
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 01/17/2007
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 01/17/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 01/17/2007
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 01/30/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 01/30/2007
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/10/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/10/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 05/23/2007
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/14/2007
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 06/21/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/21/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/21/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 06/22/2007
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/26/2007
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 09/05/2007
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 09/18/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/20/2007
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/27/2007
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 10/03/2007