Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 06/07/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 06/07/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 06/07/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/19/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/20/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/21/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/16/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/25/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/19/2008