Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 06/07/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/07/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 06/07/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 06/07/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 06/07/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/07/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 06/07/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 06/07/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/14/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/19/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/19/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/18/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 08/02/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 08/03/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/16/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 02/25/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/14/2008