Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 06/12/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 06/12/2007
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 06/12/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/14/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/19/2007
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/21/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/21/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/22/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/16/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 10/02/2007