Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/12/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 06/12/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 06/12/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 06/12/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 06/12/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 06/12/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 06/12/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 06/12/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 06/12/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/12/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 06/12/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 06/12/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 06/12/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/13/2007
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/13/2007
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/13/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/13/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/14/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 06/19/2007
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/19/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/20/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/20/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/20/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/20/2007
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/25/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/26/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/29/2007
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/17/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 12/19/2007

Show cosponsors who withdrew