Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/19/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/20/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/26/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/27/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/28/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/29/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/10/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/24/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/25/2007
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 09/25/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/16/2008
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/16/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 07/16/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/22/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/30/2008