Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 06/13/2007
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA]* 06/13/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/19/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/19/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/19/2007
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/19/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/21/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 06/25/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/25/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/26/2007
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/26/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/11/2007
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/11/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/12/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 07/13/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/13/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/13/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/19/2007