Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 06/14/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 06/14/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 06/14/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 06/14/2007
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 06/14/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 06/14/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/19/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/25/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/25/2007
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/25/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 08/01/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/06/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/07/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/07/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/11/2007