Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 06/19/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 06/19/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 06/19/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/19/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 06/19/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 06/19/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/09/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/09/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 07/26/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/30/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 08/03/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/05/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/19/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/26/2007