Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 06/19/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 06/19/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 06/21/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 06/22/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/26/2007
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 06/26/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/28/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/28/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/24/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/05/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 09/06/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/19/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/20/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/25/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/27/2007
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 09/27/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/27/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/27/2007
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/27/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/27/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/01/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 10/15/2007
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 10/18/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/22/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 11/05/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 11/06/2007
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 11/06/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 11/08/2007
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 11/15/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 12/03/2007
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 12/03/2007
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 12/18/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 12/18/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 12/19/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 12/19/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 01/22/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 02/05/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 02/05/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/14/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 04/16/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/01/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/04/2008
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/05/2008
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/19/2008
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/23/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/24/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/28/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/15/2008
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/22/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/23/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 09/26/2008