Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/28/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/10/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/22/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 12/13/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 03/11/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/15/2008
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/22/2008