Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 06/27/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 06/27/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 06/27/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 06/27/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 06/27/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/09/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 12/10/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/22/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/02/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/06/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/10/2008